RAF HIGH WYCOMBE WOS' AND SNCOS' MESS

Charity number: 1141409

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of Military efficiency by the provision of social, sporting and other activities to promote the efficiency and welfare of Servicemen and women.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £109,046
Total expenditure: £94,495

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2011: Standard registration
  • 08 January 2019: Funds received from 265377 THE EAGLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WOS' AND SNCOS' MESS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WING COMMANDER JENNIFER DENNIS Trustee 25 August 2022
ROYAL AIR FORCE HIGH WYCOMBE OFFICERS' MESS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £82.05k £73.52k £58.40k £80.13k £109.05k
Total expenditure £129.88k £47.82k £47.07k £92.89k £94.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 11 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 05 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 20 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RAF HIGH WYCOMBE
WALTER ASH
HIGH WYCOMBE
BUCKS
HP14 4UE
Phone:
01494493010
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available