B J MEHTA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes donations for the welfare and education of poor subjects; e.g. under the care of the Bharat Mata Mandir in Haridwar, India; it supports educational grants for nursing and other students in India; and works closely with the Manavta Mission Trust in India. The Charity supports UK charities including Myeloma UK; the Royal Free Charity; and the International Gauchers Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 01 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ATUL B MEHTA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CW Accountants | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr KOKILA MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £7.93k | £2.18k | £1.89k | £5.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.35k | £203 | £1.94k | £2.80k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/10/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, UNITED KINGDOM OR THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS AND OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES (3) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY AWARDING GRANTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENTS AND OR TO MAKE GRANTS TOWARDS MEDICAL RESEARCH PROJECTS FOR PERSONS LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD (4) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS) OR TO SUPPORT THEM UPON THEIR LEAVING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 FARM AVENUE
LONDON
NW2 2BH
- Phone:
- 07803789585
- Email:
- atul.mehta1@nhs.net
- Website:
-
BJMehtaFoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window