WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE SWIMMING POOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run and develop the open-air swimming pool in Symn Lane,Wotton-under-Edge for the benefit of the whole community and ensure it continues to be available in the future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £18,098 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN FRANCIS GEORGE | Chair | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Clare Diana Barrell | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Vaslet | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Anne Fisher | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Hunt | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Toy | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES SEATON BUIST | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.83k | £80.37k | £78.81k | £85.17k | £103.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.84k | £65.05k | £66.89k | £81.03k | £97.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £22.00k | £28.00k | £28.00k | £28.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | £18.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC INTERESTS. OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Culverhay
Wotton-under-Edge
GL12 7LS
- Phone:
- 01453521526
- Email:
- info@wottonpool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window