HARIS FOUNDATION (HF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. UNDERTAKEN FEASIBILITY STUDIES FOR PREPARATION Of PROJECT PROPOSALS AIMIMG AT CONTRIBUTION TO PUBLIC BENEFITS. 3. IMPLEMENTATION OF AN EXPERIMENTAL COURTYARD VEGETABLE GARDENING PROJECT IN BURY (ON GOING PROGRAMME). 3. UNDERTAKEN A SMALL SURVEY ON HOME KITCHEN AND FOOD SAFETY POSITION ON ETHNIC COMUNITY WITHIN BURY COUNCIL IN JULY 2011. 4 BANGLADESH PROJECTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 03 May 2011: Standard registration
- SHEBA INTERNATIONAL WELFARE (SIW) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZUR HARIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ATAUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ATAUR HARIS | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"), BEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURY AND ALSO THE UNITED KINGDOM AND POOR COUNTRIES ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD ARE : (1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF NEED IN PARTICULAR FOR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, DISABLED PEOPLE ORPHAN AND CHILDREN IN POVERTY IN OTHER SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE. (2) TO REDUCE UNEMPLOYMENT BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING (3) TO ADVANCE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. (4) TO THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING AND USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS (5) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR OFFICE
1C SMITHY STREET
RAMSBOTTOM
LANCASHIRE
BL0 9AT
- Phone:
- 01706827604
- Email:
- SIW1.ORG@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window