THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LLANDRINDOD WELLS HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising included Skittles night, Bingo night, Raffles, Open Garden, Coffee Mornings, Bag Packing at local Supermarkets, Shop and Local table top sales and the Hospital Tea Trolley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Powys
Governance
- 14 June 1972: Standard registration
- LLANDRINDOD WELLS LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Movita Davies | Chair | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Russell | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Bufton | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RITA DREW | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY LOUISE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL MOUNCER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.21k | £9.00k | £193.65k | £6.26k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.55k | £34.95k | £2.41k | £12.82k | £14.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPOORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LLANDRINDOD WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Winds
Gravel Road
Llanyre
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
Powys
LD1 6EB
- Phone:
- 01597822879
- Email:
- smer54@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window