Financial history PRIME TIME KIDS CLUB

Charity number: 1140465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £51.93k £57.77k £45.48k £64.91k £70.94k
Total expenditure £49.83k £54.01k £59.32k £61.49k £66.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £3.38k £4.31k £7.25k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.28k £1.00k £2.60k