GREENLEAF ANIMAL RESCUE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Provides rescue & rehoming services throughout the UK. * Local Greenleaf Sanctuaries provide a safe haven unrehomable animals in need of ongoing veterinary care and attention. * Transporting dogs on death row to safety * Cooperates with local councils/ other rescues to assist with offering rescue placements to stray and unwanted dogs * Provides Animal welfare advice /information/ assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
225 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 2011: Standard registration
- GREENLEAF RESCUE, GREENLEAF ANIMAL SANCTUARY, (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY-JANE ROSE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fay Regan | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Dyer | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.53k | £24.83k | £19.76k | £32.39k | £80.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £18.73k | £22.17k | £17.55k | £24.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenleaf Animal Rescue
148 The Rose Bowl
Portland Crescent
Leeds
West Yorkshire
LS1 3HB
- Phone:
- 0113 486 9770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window