NINETY PLUS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public, in particular but not exclusively, through participation in sport and promotion of Christianity with its participants and the community in general.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Leeds City
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- 90+ MINISTRIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES RICHARD JAGGARD | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2013 | 01/09/2014 | 01/09/2015 | 01/09/2016 | 01/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.93k | £22.59k | £9.67k | £4 | £553 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.13k | £22.71k | £9.18k | £677 | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 14/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11/04/2011
Charitable objects
INCREASING THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ESPECIALLY THROUGH AND IN SPORT, ALTHOUGH NOT NECESSARILY RESTRICTED TO THAT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Demby Farm House
Willaston Road
Thornton Hough
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH63 4JF
- Phone:
- 07850540295
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window