THE HESWALL AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Heswall and District Animal Welfare Society is to improve the quality of life for pet animals, in particular for dogs and cats in Wirral. The society seeks to find good homes for stray or unwanted dogs and cats, arranging for any necessary veterinary treatment, and to provide advice and assistance to pet owners or to members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 09 January 1973: Standard registration
- 07 March 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 March 2025: Funds transferred to 518910 THE WIRRAL ANIMAL WELFARE ASSOCIATION
- H A W S (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.56k | £38.87k | £74.28k | £13.45k | £26.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.54k | £73.24k | £50.69k | £68.99k | £40.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 117 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 2008 AND 28 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANIMALS OF ALL KINDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES ILL USAGE OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window