Accounts and annual returns THE BASIL SKYERS MYELOMA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142096
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 16 January 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2015 24 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 Not Required