THE BASIL SKYERS MYELOMA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Basil Skyers Myeloma Foundation currently operates in Nottingham, providing one off small grants, up to a maximum of -ú250 for people with Multiple Myeloma. Priority is given to patients who are within the first two years of diagnosis and only patients who are being treated or seen at Nottingham University Hospital, City Campus, Centre for Clinical Haematology are eligible to apply.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 25 May 2011: Standard registration
- 03 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.91k | £5.06k | £14.98k | £6.19k | £15.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £5.65k | £7.91k | £13.03k | £6.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 29 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 16 January 2017 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 24 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECTS") IS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH MULTIPLE MYELOMA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (1) TO PROVIDE RESOURCES FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH MULTIPLE MYELOMA AND CHARITIES THAT ARE INVOLVED IN PROVIDING DIRECT SERVICES TO MULTIPLE MYELOMA SUFFERERS WHICH ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIVES AND THE LIVES OF THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND THOSE WHO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THEM. (2) TO WORK WITH PUBLIC, PRIVATE AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AT A STRATEGIC LEVEL TO RAISE AWARENESS OF MULTIPLE MYELOMA AND ITS IMPACT ON SUFFERERS, FAMILY MEMBERS, CARERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY. (3) TO SUPPORT AND FUND MEDICAL RESEARCH IN MULTIPLE MYELOMA, TO THE INTENT THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window