ACHIEVE LIFESTYLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Achieve Lifestyle provides leisure services and facilities for the local residents of Runnymede, this includes the recreation, amateur sport, leisure and social activities of all ages and abilities. We promote good health through community participation in healthy outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,441,763
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.44m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.37k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,499,642
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.50m |
People

118 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Phillips | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Febry | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Raymond Adams | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Thomas Baker | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Patrick Oshea | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY TAYLOR | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HEAL | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01m | £1.70m | £2.94m | £3.27m | £3.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46m | £2.87m | £3.23m | £2.83m | £3.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500.00k | £128.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £1.10m | £128.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.01m | £597.60k | £2.81m | £3.27m | £3.44m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8 | £1 | £0 | £1.16k | £5.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.73m | £2.87m | £3.23m | £2.83m | £3.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £14.23k | £17.23k | £13.43k | £16.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £722.75k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £760.92k | £313.68k | £244.58k | £189.33k | £128.62k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £312.40k | £351.98k | £578.54k | £554.04k | £526.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£446.00k | -£858.00k | -£624.00k | £13.00k | £96.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £832.71k | £1.72m | £2.12m | £1.56m | £1.37m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
5. OBJECTS 5.1 THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRIMARILY FOR THE COMMUNITY IN AND VISITORS TO THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 5.1.1 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATION, AMATEUR SPORT OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED TO PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OF SPECIAL FACILITIES OR SERVICES; 5.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR EDUCATION IN SPORT, HEALTHY LIVING AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES; 5.1.3 THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; 5.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND/OR MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND/OR ART GALLERY; AND/OR 5.1.5 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC AND CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Egham Orbit
Vicarage Road
EGHAM
Surrey
TW20 8NL
- Phone:
- 01784333111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window