Governance NEW GREENWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1141023
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Registration history:
  • 31 March 2011: Standard registration
  • 04 September 2012: Funds received from 303658 GREENWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
  • 26 November 2012: Funds received from 303664 THE WOOLWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
  • 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 July 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREENWICH DISTRICT SCOUTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property