CHALLENGE (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use sport as a means to connect and inspire youth in the emerging world to achieve their potential on and off the sports field. To foster entrepreneurship and enterprise to provide brighter futures to the youth and their communities. To promote education and vocational skills that arm the youth in the emerging world with the tools needed to break free from the poverty cycle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cameroon
- Kenya
Governance
- 27 April 2011: Standard registration
- 23 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHALLENGE (Working name)
- VFV (Previous name)
- VOLUNTEERS FOR VOLUNTEERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2012 | 01/01/2013 | 01/01/2014 | 01/01/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.94k | £2.01k | £4.34k | £3.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.74k | £2.21k | £3.23k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2015 | 31 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRSUTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN CAMEROON, NEPAL AND THAILAND
Area of benefit
CAMEROON, NEPAL AND THAILAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window