BRISTOL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1140898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cultural organisation promoting music and the arts, and responsible for developing a vibrant programme of music and events at Bristol Beacon; and for supporting young people through music education activities in Bristol and the South West.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Mark Hibberd Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Simon Christopher Wales Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Councillor Joanne Clare Stafford-Townsend Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Georgia Mann Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
Sandeep Shashikant Katwala Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Christopher Shaun Seaton Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
JONATHAN DIMBLEBY Trustee 14 December 2023
THE RICHARD DIMBLEBY CANCER FUND
Received: On time
Katharine Finn Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Martino Burgess Trustee 22 July 2022
None on record
Timothy Westwell Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Craig Gentle Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
Sandra Meadows Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
SONIA MILLS Trustee 23 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.17m £15.32m £15.00m £6.69m £11.21m
Total expenditure £10.11m £14.15m £15.67m £6.72m £11.23m
Income from government contracts £1.03m £1.04m £1.03m £1.03m £777.00k
Income from government grants £810.89k £11.98m £11.90m £2.46m £5.37m
Income - Donations and legacies £9.14m £14.97m £13.81m £4.68m £7.25m
Income - Other trading activities £342.68k £137.08k £220.48k £338.81k £569.84k
Income - Charitable activities £1.68m £203.33k £973.48k £1.65m £3.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.56k £8.38k £3.64k £27.53k £172.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £24.50k £43.23k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.89m £14.00m £15.51m £4.74m £5.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.24k £18.41k £22.56k £17.49k £21.08k
Expenditure - Governance £19.45k £16.40k £22.85k £25.60k £24.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £215.20k £128.50k £139.04k £1.97m £5.29m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £149.24k £113.33k £137.97k £432.68k £435.62k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £7.84m £17.88m £15.42m £6.17m £12.52m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.27m £14.10m £12.33m £3.40m £9.78m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRISTOL BEACON
TRENCHARD STREET
BRISTOL
BS1 5AR
Phone:
01179223686