Financial history THE DONCASTER CANCER DETECTION TRUST

Charity number: 501667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.92k £19.22k £23.44k £21.61k £340.60k
Total expenditure £443.43k £3.09k £146.18k £26.15k £98.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A