THE DONCASTER CANCER DETECTION TRUST

Charity Number: 501667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the detection, prevention and treatment of cancer and aligned diseases, which may be suffered by people in the Doncaster area, and to support the medical and charitable work carried out by the NHS, St John's Hospice and other organisations in the Doncaster area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £340,597
Total expenditure: £98,121

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ST JOHNS HOSPICE APPEAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YVONNE WOODCOCK Chair 13 December 2011
FRIENDS OF DONCASTER MANSION HOUSE
Received: On time
Jane Nadin Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Jon David Lister Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Georgina Mullis Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Victoria Fletcher Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.92k £19.22k £23.44k £21.61k £340.60k
Total expenditure £443.43k £3.09k £146.18k £26.15k £98.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RESOLUTION DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPIVE AND OTHER INDIVIDUALS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK,CONVALESCENT,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPICE.THE HOSPICE IS TO BE KNOWN AS ST JOHNS HOSPICE
Area of benefit
DONCASTER
Registration history
  • 10 September 1985 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
22 Wood Street
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN1 3LW
Phone:
01302 325029