THE PMF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1140921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of sickness, distress, poverty and the advancement of education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 14 February 2024

Total income: £1,700
Total expenditure: £1,533

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Goodall Trustee
None on record
ANGIE GOODALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/02/2020 14/02/2021 14/02/2022 14/02/2023 14/02/2024
Total gross income £3.75k £500 £3.38k £5.46k £1.70k
Total expenditure £4.00k £500 £2.82k £5.82k £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 February 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2020 16 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COPPICE FARM
ASHLEY ROAD
ASHLEY
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 3PT
Phone:
07775858113
Website:

No information available