1863 CLUB SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes community participation in healthy recreation amongst the pupils of the London Oratory School, Seagrave Road, London SW6, by the provision of funds, equipment, coaching and facilities for rowing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hounslow
Governance
- 27 May 2011: Standard registration
- THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL BOAT CLUB SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Djamilia Tiberghien-Kurmanbaeva | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Somone | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Florus Peter Plantenga | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mauro Ferone | Trustee | 24 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Alston | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.57k | £18.58k | £42.38k | £46.02k | £67.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.18k | £35.33k | £34.73k | £51.00k | £84.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AMONGST THE PUPILS OF THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL, SEAGRAVE ROAD, LONDON SW6, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, EQUIPMENT, COACHING AND FACILITIES FOR ROWING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Eaton Place
London
SW1X 8AL
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- 1863clubsg@gmail.com
- Website:
-
1863club.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window