Whitley Bay Musical Theatre Company Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE CONTINUE TO PROVIDE MUSICAL SHOWS AND CONCERTS WITHIN NORTH TYNESIDE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- WHITLEY BAY OPERATIC SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Josephine Kelly | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Murtagh | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Racheal Falcus | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Donald | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Joseph Taylor Robinson | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jean McKinnell | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ANN STOKES | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY DAVID JONES | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.72k | £16.96k | £3.26k | £18.95k | £26.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.72k | £24.59k | £1.10k | £21.14k | £26.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 June 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 June 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/2011 as amended on 21 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF OPERATIC WORKS OF HIGHEST STANDARD (B) TO SUPPORT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Princess Louise Road
BLYTH
Northumberland
NE24 2ND
- Phone:
- 11
- Email:
- whitleybaymtc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window