EASTWOOD HIGH SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the PTA are to advance the education of pupils in the school by developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school and engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school in advancing the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 23 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine Cassidy | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Tomkins | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320 | £0 | £0 | £30 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £670 | £200 | £0 | £0 | £45 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2021 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE SOUTHEND-ON-SEA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTWOOD HIGH SCHOOL
RAYLEIGH ROAD
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 5UU
- Phone:
- 01702524341
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window