CARESCO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARESCO works to meet needs within the community of Sawtry and the surrounding villages in the county of Cambridgeshire. To do this CARESCO runs a day care club, a weekly cafe, a car scheme, a Christmas Day party, a carers group, the local food bank, a prescription delivery service, a men's shed, a social club and a charity shop. CARESCO also edits and publishes the village magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,651 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 08 March 2011: Standard registration
- 16 May 2012: Funds received from 288202 SAWTRY AND DISTRICT CARE AND RESOURCE ORGANISATION...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Brian Dougherty | Chair | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne May Merton | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise Whiley | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Marie Bohonis | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tina Campbell | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.24k | £215.65k | £182.58k | £215.79k | £242.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.76k | £184.04k | £212.83k | £235.78k | £268.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.81k | £114.83k | £35.26k | £30.28k | £25.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF SAWTRY AND SATELLITE VILLAGES, IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE, AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; TO IDENTIFY WELFARE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS IN SAWTRY AND ITS SATELLITE VILLAGES, DEVISING MEANS TO MEET THOSE NEEDS, WITH THE HELP OF VOLUNTEERS, AND TO ENLIST THE BACKING AND CO-OPERATION OF THE STATUTORY SERVICES AND EXISTING VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS AND ANY OTHER MEDIUM.
Area of benefit
SAWTRY AND SATELLITE VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARESCO
GREEN END ROAD
SAWTRY
HUNTINGDON
PE28 5UX
- Phone:
- 01487832105
- Email:
- office@caresco.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window