Kowneyn Education and Cultural Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
after school club supplementary education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 02 June 2011: Standard registration
- Nowneyn education and cultural centre (Previous name)
- SECC (Previous name)
- SOMALI EDUCATION AND CULTURAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMED ABDALLA OSMAN | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Abdulkadir Haji Ahmed | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdirahim ahmed | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdifatah Abdullahi Abdi | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamud salah | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Asli Hassa Mahamed | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdulmajid Mohamed Hersi | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Abdirizak | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUSSEIN ABDALLAH OSMAN | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.00k | £47.22k | £36.16k | £55.57k | £42.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.24k | £42.02k | £39.75k | £28.74k | £11.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2021 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/09/2006 as amended on 05 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUNDS AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BORDESLEY GREEN IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM (THE AREA OF BENEFIT),AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE ARE SUITABLE TO BE PURSUED IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH ADVANCEMENT INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Revesby Walk
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4LG
- Phone:
- 07908854187
- Email:
- info@masjidatarbiya.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window