WRA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objectives of WRA Charitable Trust is to provide relief to those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage. Also to promote welfare for the armed forces including assistance to ex-service personnel and/or their families. Furthermore, to advance public awareness and the education of those involved in managing the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabel Rachel Asprey | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ASPREY | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROLLS ASPREY | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.43k | £24.76k | £29.51k | £37.21k | £46.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.72k | £36.98k | £27.14k | £20.63k | £26.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE TO PROMOTE WELFARE FOR THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES TO ADVANCE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND THE EDUCATION OF THOSE INVOLVED IN MANAGING THE COUNTRYSIDE OF THE NEED FOR THE CONTINUED PRESERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND COUNTRY SPORTING PURSUITS ANY OTHER PURPOSES CURRENTLY RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND ANY NEW CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE SIMILAR TO ANOTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26E Bolton Gardens
LONDON
SW5 0AQ
- Phone:
- 0207493 8385
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window