Trustees THE RECTORIAL BENEFICE OF MARGAM
Charity number: 1140732

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Lewis | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Scourfield | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annette Evans | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
jeanette Keane | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Danielle Willis | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Shawe BA LRAM | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Wayne David | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Thomas | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Boscott | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret Perren | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE EDWARDS | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Edwards | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
William John Roberts | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Rev'd Jonathan Durley | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Baker | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL MICHAEL SMART PHD, C.ENG | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Phillips | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||
David-Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||
The Rev'd Dr Duncan Walker | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.