ASPIRING COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in partnership with local communities and other organisations, our charitable aims,objects and activities centre around three main themes. Advancement of communities Advancement of health Advancement of religion. Our fundraising activities are broad based and include fundraising from geographic territories and countries outwith our area/country of operations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£659,967
Donations and legacies | £657.42k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.55k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£351,008
Raising funds | £188.65k | |
Charitable activities | £162.17k | |
Other | £185 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £188.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £162.17k | |
Retained for future use | £308.96k |
People

3 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
- Saudi Arabia
Governance
- 04 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NADEEM MAHAMMED HANIF | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAHAN ZEB AHMED | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
NAZARBAT MAHROOF | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.10k | £353.70k | £760.21k | £598.65k | £659.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £359.06k | £494.22k | £801.77k | £475.77k | £351.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £760.18k | £596.78k | £657.42k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £27 | £1.87k | £2.55k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £60.44k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £801.77k | £475.77k | £162.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £188.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £59.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £185 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.17m | £1.27m | £1.25m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £1.52m | £1.55m | £1.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £729.83k | £726.71k | £1.19m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LEEDS, AND LOCATIONS IN SCOTLAND, IRELAND AND PAKISTAN, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Barkly Road
Leeds
LS11 7EN
- Phone:
- 07877526790
- Email:
- info@aspiringcommunities.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window