CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith worldwide. It may establish churches and community centres, carry out and direct discipleship evangelistic missionary and ecumenical activity, administer or support training, provide advice resources and services to those affected by social and economic circumstances and promote or organinse programmes to engage young people in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 04 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr THEODORE BALDERSTON | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BALDERSTON | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN LOUIS SMITH | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr YVES-YANNICK FORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.31k | £16.65k | £27.80k | £77.28k | £42.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.30k | £13.64k | £22.15k | £35.04k | £36.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornerstone Christian Fellowship
Bishops Oak Ride
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN10 3NT
- Phone:
- 01732838176
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window