Accounts and annual returns SIKH SPORT UK

Charity number: 1144555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 December 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 November 2024 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required