CO-ORDINATION AGENCY FOR FIRE AND RESCUE AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VISION To facilitate the deployment of expertise, advice and resources to mitigate risks and hazards in civil communities. AIM To make a real difference to the lives of people around the world by delivering sustainable civil protection projects, based on best practise, which create better informed, equipped and prepared communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
- Philippines
- Portugal
Governance
- 19 May 2011: Standard registration
- 12 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAFFRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.66k | £14.94k | £7.20k | £22.09k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.16k | £18.91k | £8.34k | £13.65k | £28.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 27 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE:- 3.1 THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE AND SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITATION TO BY TRAINING AND EQUIPPING FIRE AND RESCUE AGENCIES IN OVERSEAS COUNTRIES TO ENABLE THEM TO BE BETTER PLACES TO OFFER DAY TO DAY FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICES AND TO DEAL WITH NATURAL DISASTERS AND CONFLICT SITUATIONS SHOULD THEY OCCUR; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING, IN PARTIUCLAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE OVERSEAS WHERE THERE HAS BEEN SOME FORM OF NATURAL OR OTHER KIND OF DISASTER OR CONFLICT THEREBY ENABLING THE REBUILDING AND RECONSTUCTION OF COMMUNITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window