DPA PERFORMING ARTS ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY OFFERING CLASSES, WORKSHOPS AND LOCAL PERFORMANCES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 August 2011: Standard registration
- DPA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giuseppe Mazzilli | Chair | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Muller | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lois Todd | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Pierce | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mazzilli | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lutz Muller | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Paula Thompson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.08k | £100.58k | £157.88k | £157.01k | £176.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.59k | £94.99k | £141.44k | £156.72k | £174.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | £8.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY OFFERING CLASSES, WORKSHOPS AND LOCAL PERFORMANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
DPA Academy Of Performing Arts
1A-2 Longs Industrial Estate
Englands Lane,Gorleston
GREAT YARMOUTH
Norfolk
NR31 6NE
- Phone:
- 01493718292
- Email:
- enquiries@dpadreams.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window