Trustees ALTOFTS COMMUNITY AND SPORTS FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1142340

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Whalley | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Greatorex | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Honey | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Widdop | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Johnson | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hepworth | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Greatorex | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alfie Norris | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffery Holmes | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GREATOREX | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORRIS | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.