AGE CONCERN WARSOP & DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop-in facilities, Monday to Friday 9am - 3pm for with cafe for light refreshments. Coach outings are arranged on a regular basis throughout the year. Small Charity Shop to help raise funds open Monday -Friday at drop-in centre. Free Christmas Lunch provided for 125 elderly residents of Warsop and the surrounding villages each December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 August 1972: Standard registration
- THE WARSOP AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- WARSOP AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ALLIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Halina Ann Kochanowski | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
RUTH THERESA CARMODY | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margery Bonser | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.80k | £24.61k | £26.01k | £17.07k | £19.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.61k | £24.00k | £11.95k | £11.14k | £22.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 August 2021 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1952 AS, AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 1994, 18 JULY 2000 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF WARSOP (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WARSOP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Age Concern
14 High Street
Warsop
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG20 0AG
- Phone:
- 01623845406
- Email:
- ageconcernwarsop@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window