SIGNAL FAMILY SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and to relieve the needs of children and young people on the autism spectrum and their families and carers resident in the London Borough of Lewisham. Campaigning on issues relating to the needs of our members such as education and social services and maintaining representation on several local forums and working parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 28 July 2011: Standard registration
- 19 March 2013: Funds received from 1021706 SIGNAL
- SIGNAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dola Akinola | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pete Black | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yolanda Welch | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Nwaordu | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.91k | £67.38k | £69.68k | £59.87k | £38.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.74k | £44.92k | £60.13k | £73.05k | £75.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ALLEVIATE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUTUAL SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE AND THROUGH THE PROVISION, OR THE COMMISSIONING OF, FACILITIES, SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 40, Albany Centre & Theatre
Douglas Way
LONDON
SE8 4AG
- Phone:
- 07946632477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window