Financial history THE ERIC FRANK TRUST

Charity Number: 1144693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £107.66k £107.66k £11.55k £27.45k £29.52k
Total expenditure £83.42k £83.42k £54.37k £65.85k £77.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A