LAZO KONCAR M.B.E. FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsorship of a 2 year coaching programme to blind and partially sighted 11 - 19 year olds at New College Worcester given by Louise Sayani, Illuminate You, a company which aims to inspire people through Life Coaching, Training and Development, Consultancy, Youth Coaching and Youth Projects. The aim is to increase their confidence and overcoming loss of sight whilst maintaining their self belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MILAN RADMAN BSC, MSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD H SNELLING | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr JELENA MANOJLOVIC PHD MED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA CLARE RADMAN BSC DPL MS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND HELP DISABLED AND OTHERWISE CHALLENGED CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH A PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B PROVIDING SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 MELDON CLOSE
LONDON
SW6 2AW
- Phone:
- 07771903396
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window