Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PARC EGLOS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1144760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 January 2024 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 January 2024 577 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required