THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDYTH'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Church Services are held; two on a Sunday and one on a Tuesday morning. Outreach is important to St Edyth's and free events are randomly held for the community of Sea Mills and Coombe Dingle to show God's love. We also regularly support charities both in the UK and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 04 April 2011: Standard registration
- ST EDYTH'S CHURCH CHARITY NAME (Working name)
- ST EDYTH'S CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Woodhouse | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Thomas | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wright | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Speakman | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marks | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fry | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SPOTTISWOODE | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Teresa Goodall | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zachariah Abraham | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Marks | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.53k | £145.73k | £136.70k | £110.86k | £155.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.82k | £132.56k | £122.01k | £142.59k | £138.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 01/01/1956
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avonleaze
Sea Mills
Bristol
BS9 2HU
- Phone:
- 01179686965
- Email:
- office@stedyths.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window