DERBY CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1142341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Administering the activities of the Methodist churches in Derby.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

63 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond John Forey Trustee 01 September 2024
MICKLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Jason Grant Kennedy Trustee 01 December 2023
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Peter's Littleover and Blagreaves
Received: On time
Angela Davies Trustee 01 September 2023
LITTLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christopher Ian Paynter Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Donald Stanley Olivant Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Wendy Roome Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Jenny Kilgour Trustee 21 December 2022
None on record
DEACON ROSEMARY BELL Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Rev Moira Biggins Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Ian Frearson Trustee 13 June 2022
ARCTIC RESEARCH GROUP
Received: On time
Susannah Simpson Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Fiona Riley-Schnoor Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Colin Young Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Rev Christopher Briggs Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Lynette Nash Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Paul Desborough Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Graham Martin Trustee 01 September 2021
LITTLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Jacqueline Quarmby Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Aubrey Herbert Boyes Morris Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rev Calvin Cheung Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Ruth Mollie Croft Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Hazel Ellison MEd Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Andrew John Moore Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Rev David Rhys Owen Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Joanna Marie Howie Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Deacon Jane Rice Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Peter John Middlehurst BSc Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
RICHARD EDWARD HUBBALL BSC HONS Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
REV NEIL DRAPER Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
JANET MARION PATMORE Trustee 01 September 2017
MICKLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Mairi Janet Radcliffe Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
STEPHEN LEE Trustee 06 November 2016
THE DROP INN
Charity reporting is overdue by 781 days
Judith Kathleen Neal Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
BRENDA ELIZABETH WIGLEY Trustee 17 March 2016
None on record
MARIE HOLT Trustee 25 February 2016
None on record
HILARY LEONORA HANDLEY Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
ERIC GRAHAM SMITH RGN Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
KELVIN SMITH Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
ROY EDWARD MILWARD FCCA Trustee 12 October 2013
None on record
SALLY JEAN LEVITT Trustee 11 October 2013
None on record
JOHN SPRAY Trustee 11 October 2013
None on record
Guowei HONG Trustee 11 October 2013
CHINESE FAMILY FOR CHRIST UK
Received: On time
FRANKIE KWOK WING WONG BDS Trustee 11 October 2013
None on record
Rev COLIN JOHN EMERSON Trustee 01 February 2013
None on record
BRENDA KATHLEEN LEEDS Trustee 01 February 2013
None on record
IAN SANT Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
GWEN PETCH Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
MICHAEL ROGER WILLIAMS Trustee 09 June 2011
LITTLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MARY LILY CALLADINE Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
LINDA ANN SANDARS Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
NEIL CLARKE Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
PETER JOHN PRIESTLEY FCA Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
Rev RAYMOND LUNT FCA Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
NORMA FEARN Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
JUDITH ELAINE SMITH NNEB Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
TED AGER Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
DOREEN HINDS Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
CHRISTINE ETHEL CAMERON BA HONS Trustee 29 April 2011
None on record
MARY DIANA MURDEN Trustee 29 April 2011
None on record
DAVID DANIEL MACDONALD Trustee 29 April 2011
None on record
ANN ELIZABETH SMITH Trustee 29 April 2011
None on record
ALAN DOUGLAS CASTLEDINE FCA Trustee 29 April 2011
CLOWER BEQUEST FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
WILLIAM TURNER SHAW FOR METHODIST CHAPEL IN KING STREET, DERBY
Received: On time
MICHAEL BAGWORTH Trustee 29 April 2011
DERBYSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
MICKLEOVER METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £432.82k £610.35k £463.63k £1.06m £602.43k
Total expenditure £489.05k £567.62k £526.68k £693.09k £595.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £455.51k N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £11.81k N/A £47.68k £87.94k
Income - Other N/A £143.04k N/A £1.01m £514.49k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £567.62k N/A £3.93k £3.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.30k N/A £3.93k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £689.16k £591.20k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A £2.69m N/A £1.68m £1.68m
Long-term investments N/A £222.13k N/A £194.37k £188.93k
Other assets N/A £566.99k N/A £2.50m £2.50m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £157.63k N/A £139.66k £131.28k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
76 BLENHEIM DRIVE
ALLESTREE
DERBY
DE22 2LE
Phone:
01332556544