Financial history LOWESTOFT AND BECCLES PRIMARY SCHOOLS SPORTS PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1141380
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 29/02/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £57.62k £57.18k £26.04k £13.43k £6.76k
Total expenditure £81.51k £68.14k £40.07k £21.06k £19.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.94k £0 N/A