FRIENDS OF THORLEY HILL

Charity number: 1141392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds for Thorley Hill Primary School in order to enrich the school community. Encouraging parents to become involved in the children's education. Developing links with the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £10,081
Total expenditure: £4,325

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THORLEY HILL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Chard Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Ceri Margerison-Bird Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Susanne Schuster- Gray Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Victoria Draper Trustee 21 July 2022
YOUTH CREATE
Received: On time
Alison Quick Trustee 12 December 2018
None on record
Emma Hookham Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.84k £7.35k £11.75k £10.51k £10.08k
Total expenditure £2.93k £10.98k £7.50k £10.99k £4.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thorley Hill Primary School
Park Lane
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 3NH
Phone:
01279654496
Website:

No information available