TLC: TOGETHER FOR LOOKED-AFTER CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises awareness of the need to enhance the life chances and educational success of Calderdale's Looked-After Children and young people. It will raise funds to deliver specific projects to assist Looked-After Children and young people to fulfil their potential, over and above the care & support they already receive from statutory service providers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
Governance
- 12 April 2011: Standard registration
- TLC/TLC CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER LISTER BSC HONS | Chair | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Bowyer | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lucy Ingle | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lois Highton | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES BRICKDALE | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Catherine Kirk | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||
HOWARD BLAGBROUGH | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|||||
CRAIG WHITTAKER | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £10.06k | £5.30k | £12.27k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.22k | £417 | £22.34k | £450 | £17.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 January 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LIFE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN CALDERDALE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, IN NEED BY REASON OF BEING A LOOKED-AFTER CHILD, BY FACILITATING ADDITIONAL RESOURCES OVER AND ABOVE THOSE PROVIDED BY STATUTORY SERVICE PROVIDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sleigh & Story Ltd
Thornhill Brigg Mill
Thornhill Beck Lane
BRIGHOUSE
West Yorkshire
HD6 4AH
- Phone:
- 01484505306
- Email:
- contacttlccharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window