UK TENPIN BOWLING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support, development and delivery of activities relating to increasing participation in the sport of tenpin bowling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2012: Standard registration
- 15 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- UKTBF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2013 | 30/03/2014 | 30/03/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2015 | 16 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2014 | 16 September 2015 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | 26 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/06/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TENPIN BOWLING; AND 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (INCLUDING SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; AND (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window