BLYTH MUSIC AND THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1146360
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A non profit making, local amateur dramatic and music society, encouraging any new members and also a thriving youth academy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £31,470
Total expenditure: £30,501

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BMTCL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Louise Johnston Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Graeme Thomas Sutherland Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
June Angela Fisher Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record
MAURICE JOHN DOBSON Trustee 02 July 2014
THE DOBSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JACQUELINE ANN GREY Trustee 23 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.92k £0 £15.60k £17.49k £31.47k
Total expenditure £21.51k £1.74k £17.21k £21.78k £30.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 25 April 2025 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 25 April 2025 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 15 December 2024 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 March 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bell Tindle Williamson
63 Saville Street
North Shields
NE30 1AY
Phone:
01912577113
Website:

blythmusicandtheatrecompanylimited.foxmaker.com