THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL MITCHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provisionof regular Acts of Worship which are open to all people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 05 May 2011: Standard registration
- MITCHAM PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV David Malcolm Benedict Pennells | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Perera | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Dixie | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hylton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian Carpenter | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MULLER-CARPENTER | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hornsby | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Coggins | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN COGGINS | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|||||
KATHERINE CHANDLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV JACKIE COCKFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.00k | £95.91k | £168.83k | £156.36k | £140.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.06k | £115.98k | £189.54k | £166.12k | £177.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mitcham Parish Church
Church Path
MITCHAM
CR4 3BN
- Phone:
- 020 8648 1566
- Email:
- mpcsspeterpaul@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window