MSOPC

Charity number: 1147878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enhance the lives of older people in Mid Sussex by open meetings, newsletters and drop in meetings by which we offer information on general finances, keeping warm, health care advice and issues local to Mid Sussex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,194
Total expenditure: £6,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MID SUSSEX OLDER PEOPLES COUNCIL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE UPTON Chair 09 January 2015
None on record
Carol Dianne Misler Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Jeanette Howarth Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
Barbara Baldwin Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.24k £3.18k £8.32k £14.96k £13.19k
Total expenditure £8.01k £1.94k £1.94k £10.50k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £250 N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A £11.85k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 November 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 February 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
93 BARNMEAD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 1XB
Phone:
01444453332
Website:

msopc.org.uk