KICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kick runs both sports and mentoring programmes for 11-18 year olds in various locations across Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £11,192 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Drye | Chair | 01 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Lina Nieto | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BURGESS | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.84k | £71.09k | £53.48k | £111.88k | £113.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.88k | £53.02k | £45.63k | £92.54k | £95.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.42k | £11.57k | £24.82k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | £9.77k | N/A | £11.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PRESERVING AND PROTECTING GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVING POVERTY; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Ives Town Hall
Market Hill
ST. IVES
Cambridgeshire
PE27 5AL
- Phone:
- 07539250578
- Email:
- tony@kickyouth.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window