THE KING'S COMMUNITY CHURCH, STAINES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The pupose of the charity is to propogate the Christian Gospel. The commission is from the 'Great Commission' in the scriptures; "therefore go and make disciples of all nations, baptising them in the name of the Father and the Son and the Holy Spirit, teaching them to obey everything I have commanded you" (Mathew 28 v 19-20).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 April 2011: Standard registration
- 20 January 2012: Funds received from 288292 THE KINGS CHURCH STAINES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH JEFFREY DONNELLY | Chair | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jean Dunningham | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Esther Rowe | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM STUART DOUGLAS | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.14k | £66.27k | £52.65k | £56.98k | £74.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.09k | £68.30k | £80.11k | £81.04k | £86.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN STAINES AND SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS AND WHO MAY BE AGED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 Hithermoor Road
Staines-upon-Thames
TW19 6AU
- Phone:
- 01753685967
- Email:
- kccs-thewell@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
kingscommunitychurchstaines.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window