SOUTH MID-SUSSEX COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health within South Mid-Sussex by the provision of trained volunteers to attend medical emergencies as directed by the South East Coast Ambulance Service or its successors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- BOLNEY AREA RESPONSE TEAM (Working name)
- BURGESS HILL AREA RESPONSE TEAM (Working name)
- HURSTPIERPOINT & HASSOCKS COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS (Working name)
- HEART BEAT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA JAYNE SMALE | Chair | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Mulhern | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES TOBY STAPLES | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN MIDDLEHURST | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £500 | £2.15k | £3.03k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.79k | £3.56k | £688 | £13.46k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN SOUTH MID-SUSSEX BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINED VOLUNTEERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY THE SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICE OR ITS SUCCESSORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Dumbrills Close
Burgess Hill
RH15 8RU
- Phone:
- 07801292324
- Email:
- smscfrbur01@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window