THE ORP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to maintain the investment holdings of the charity, whilst generating income to donate to charities at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- 11 July 2012: Funds received from 280071 INES NEWMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Oppenheimer | Chair | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Lou Newman | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hodge | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Oppenheimer | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Edmonds | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.64k | £68.57k | £73.58k | £49.19k | £199.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.99k | £68.19k | £48.94k | £138.91k | £266.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C /O Berg Kaprow Lewis
35 Ballards Lane
LONDON
N3 1XW
- Phone:
- 07786696772
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window