Financial history THE CHORAL FOUNDATION, THE CHAPEL ROYAL, HAMPTON COURT PALACE

Charity number: 1142075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £49.07k £49.50k £121.18k £80.24k £176.91k
Total expenditure £91.91k £31.50k £41.70k £95.41k £78.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A